TN SB1895 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a utility to notify the utility's customer and the owner of the property, if different from the utility's customer, when the utility service provided to a property by the utility is terminated. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 65; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 65; Title 68 and Title 69, relative to termination of utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1879 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee