TN SB1895 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the emergency communications board, June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 7, Chapter 86, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, extends the emergency communications board, June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 7, Chapter 86, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Watson (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Watson (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Held on desk. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conf. comm. appointed. (Sen. Bell, Gardenhire, Harper) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. refused to concur in am. 1 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 5 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1236) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 24, Nays 6 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1119) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1095) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1634 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-15 - Comp. SB subst.