TN SB1894 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a board under the division of health related boards from renewing the license of a licensee who has not paid the licensee's renewal fee and is currently incarcerated; clarifies that emergency summary suspension or revocation of a health care provider's license by a licensing board does not require the prior approval of the attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a board under the division of health related boards from renewing the license of a licensee who has not paid the licensee's renewal fee and is currently incarcerated; clarifies that emergency summary suspension or revocation of a health care provider's license by a licensing board does not require the prior approval of the attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 3/11/20 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2726 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration