TN SB1892 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under insurance policies. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under insurance policies. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee / behind the budget |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 3/18/20 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Commerce & Labor Comm. 3/17/20 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1699 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-18 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0