TN SB1877 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds quadriplegia as a qualifying medical condition for the lawful possession of cannabis oil. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 68, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 68, Chapter 7, relative to qualifying medical diagnoses for the use of medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1054 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 3/30/22 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1747 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022