TN SB1877 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires comptroller to audit use of civil asset forfeiture proceeds by local law enforcement agencies and judicial district drug task forces during regular audit of local government; requires department of safety to publish uses of forfeiture proceeds by department and results of comptroller's audit on department's website. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires comptroller to audit use of civil asset forfeiture proceeds by local law enforcement agencies and judicial district drug task forces during regular audit of local government; requires department of safety to publish uses of forfeiture proceeds by department and results of comptroller's audit on department's website. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 4 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 999
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/21/2018; 07/01/2018
2018-05-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-24HousePassed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-24HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0947)
2018-04-24HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-23SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-04-23SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-18SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-02-28SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2018-02-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
2018-02-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
2018-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/21/2018
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
2018-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2143 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 999

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback