TN SB1861 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 909
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 909
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of education to withhold a portion of the state education finance funds that an LEA is otherwise eligible to receive if the LEA fails or refuses to determine a student's gender, for purposes of participation in school sports, by the student's sex at the time of birth; exempts an LEA that fails or refuses to determine a student's gender, for purposes of participation in school sports, by the student's sex at the time of birth if the LEA's failure or refusal to do so is required by a court or other legally binding order. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to school sports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 909 | |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1895 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2022, 07/01/2022