TN SB1859 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, shifts from December 31 each year to May 1 in 2018 and to November 1 in 2019 and years thereafter the date by which the holder of abandoned property must file a report with the treasurer regarding the property. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-125.
Title
As enacted, shifts from December 31 each year to May 1 in 2018 and to November 1 in 2019 and years thereafter the date by which the holder of abandoned property must file a report with the treasurer regarding the property. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-125.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 822 | |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2278 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 822