TN SB1849 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the retail sale of marijuana; levies a 12 percent tax on the retail sale of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the retail sale of marijuana; levies a 12 percent tax on the retail sale of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
2020-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020
2020-06-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-06-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
2020-01-29SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2389 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback