TN SB1838 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates one additional trial court in the 18th judicial district. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 2, relative to judicial districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2024 | |
2024-04-03 | Pub. Ch. 600 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2715 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600