TN SB1837 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the state, a political subdivision, or a public official from prohibiting, or imposing additional restrictions on, the lawful operations of a church or religious organization, including religious services or activities, during a state of emergency, major disaster, or natural disaster. - Amends TCA Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, relative to prohibiting certain actions during an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1694 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration