TN SB1835 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person appointed by the governor to serve as the commissioner of education to be confirmed by the general assembly by joint resolution in order to serve as the chief executive officer of the department; requires the commissioner to submit the commissioner's strategic plan for the department to the state board of education for approval. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 8 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 8 and Title 49, relative to the department of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/19/2020 2/12/2020 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/19/2020 2/12/2020 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1717 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
HB1548 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
HB1548 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction