TN SB1835 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 895
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 895
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that each year at least 30 percent, instead of 70 percent, of the items on state assessments in grades 3-8 and end of course examinations in high school be fresh, nonredundant items that did not appear on the tests in the previous two years, instead of the previous four years for grades 3-8 and the previous three years for high school tests. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-610.
Title
As enacted, requires that each year at least 30 percent, instead of 70 percent, of the items on state assessments in grades 3-8 and end of course examinations in high school be fresh, nonredundant items that did not appear on the tests in the previous two years, instead of the previous four years for grades 3-8 and the previous three years for high school tests. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-610.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 895 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/10/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2247 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 895