TN SB1834 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 180 to 185 the number of days following cancellation, due to a natural disaster of an event sponsored by a charitable organization, that must elapse before ticket buyers forfeit refund of the purchase price. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, extends from 180 to 185 the number of days following cancellation, due to a natural disaster of an event sponsored by a charitable organization, that must elapse before ticket buyers forfeit refund of the purchase price. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47 and Title 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1711 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee