TN SB1832 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens the definitions of "all-terrain vehicle" and "Class 1 off-highway vehicle" to include vehicles less than 2,500 pounds, instead of 1,500 pounds; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 47 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, broadens the definitions of "all-terrain vehicle" and "Class 1 off-highway vehicle" to include vehicles less than 2,500 pounds, instead of 1,500 pounds; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 47 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 585 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1683 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 585