TN SB1830 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits any NPDES permit that is issued to a municipal separate storm sewer system ("MS4") administrator in this state from imposing post-construction stormwater requirements, except to the extent necessary to comply with the minimum requirements of federal law; prohibits the state from requiring any entity that administers a MS4 under an NPDES permit to impose control measures for post-construction stormwater that exceed the minimum requirements of federal law; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, prohibits any NPDES permit that is issued to a municipal separate storm sewer system ("MS4") administrator in this state from imposing post-construction stormwater requirements, except to the extent necessary to comply with the minimum requirements of federal law; prohibits the state from requiring any entity that administers a MS4 under an NPDES permit to impose control measures for post-construction stormwater that exceed the minimum requirements of federal law; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 40 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 40 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 1007 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/23/2016 | |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Returned by Governor without signature. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 18, PNV 1 |
2016-04-07 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0756) |
2016-04-07 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1097) |
2016-04-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0753) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/7/2016 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1892 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007