TN SB1829 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the board, in consultation with the department of education, to develop an alternative graduation pathway for high school students interested in pursuing technical training or a technical career after graduation; authorizes the commissioner of education to waive graduation requirements if compliance with same would delay or impair a student's ability to pursue technical training or their technical career goals. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to graduation requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1726 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1829&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB1829.pdf |