TN SB1829 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Stolen Valor Act" by creating the crime of fraudulently representing that a person is a member of a branch of the armed services or the recipient of certain military awards for the purpose of obtaining property, money, or services to which the person is not otherwise entitled. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Stolen Valor Act" by creating the crime of fraudulently representing that a person is a member of a branch of the armed services or the recipient of certain military awards for the purpose of obtaining property, money, or services to which the person is not otherwise entitled. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1779 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee