TN SB1825 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the Tennessee higher education commission to submit a report to the governor and speakers of the senate and house of representatives by December 31, 2023, on issues of food insecurity among students at public institutions of higher education in this state and that identifies and describes the efforts of the institutions to address food insecurity among students. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 50; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9; Title 53 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 50; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9; Title 53 and Title 71, relative to food insecurity at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 829 | |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1669 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022