TN SB1817 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the conduct of law enforcement personnel in initiating or continuing pursuit of a fleeing party to be in reckless disregard of law enforcement policies and procedures in order for the law enforcement personnel or the employer of the law enforcement personnel to be liable for injuries to a third party proximately caused by a fleeing party. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, requires the conduct of law enforcement personnel in initiating or continuing pursuit of a fleeing party to be in reckless disregard of law enforcement policies and procedures in order for the law enforcement personnel or the employer of the law enforcement personnel to be liable for injuries to a third party proximately caused by a fleeing party. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1850 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration