TN SB1816 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to annually compile a list of courses that may be substituted for certain high school course requirements; requires the department, by April 15 of each year, to distribute the list to each LEA and public charter high school and to the Tennessee higher education commission for distribution to high school counselors and to public institutions of higher education in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to annually compile a list of courses that may be substituted for certain high school course requirements; requires the department, by April 15 of each year, to distribute the list to each LEA and public charter high school and to the Tennessee higher education commission for distribution to high school counselors and to public institutions of higher education in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1679 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration