TN SB1815 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 957
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 957
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the penalty for patronizing a prostitute under age 18 from a Class E felony to a Class A felony; increases the penalty for patronizing a prostitute with an intellectual disability from a Class E felony to a Class B felony; specifies that it is not a defense that the subject of the offense is a law enforcement officer or that the victim of the offense is a minor who consented to the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, increases the penalty for patronizing a prostitute under age 18 from a Class E felony to a Class A felony; increases the penalty for patronizing a prostitute with an intellectual disability from a Class E felony to a Class B felony; specifies that it is not a defense that the subject of the offense is a law enforcement officer or that the victim of the offense is a minor who consented to the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 957 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2326 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 957