TN SB1812 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the ability of a person who is a handgun carry permit holder or otherwise authorized to lawfully carry a handgun with the intent to go armed to transport and store a firearm or firearm ammunition in the person's motor vehicle while on or utilizing any public or private parking area in which firearms are otherwise prohibited. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |