TN SB1808 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the time required for written notice to be issued to members of the district public defenders conference prior to any meeting called by the president of the conference. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the time required for written notice to be issued to members of the district public defenders conference prior to any meeting called by the president of the conference. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1849 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.