TN SB1808 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 826
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the "Employee Online Privacy Act of 2014" which prevents an employer from requiring an employee to disclose the username and password for the employee's personal internet account except under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 18; Title 49 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates the "Employee Online Privacy Act of 2014" which prevents an employer from requiring an employee to disclose the username and password for the employee's personal internet account except under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 18; Title 49 and Title 50.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16HousePub. Ch. 826
2014-05-16HouseEffective date(s) 01/01/2015
2014-04-29HouseGovernor returned.
2014-04-16HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2014-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2014-04-15HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2014-04-14HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2014-04-10HouseS. concurred in H. am. 1
2014-04-09HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014
2014-04-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0
2014-04-09HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1229)
2014-04-02HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2014
2014-04-02HouseReset on Regular cal. for 4/09/14
2014-03-31HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2014
2014-03-31HouseReset on Next Available Regular cal.
2014-03-31HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2014-03-31SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2014-03-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2014-03-27SenatePassed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2014-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014
2014-03-20SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2014-03-19SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014
2014-03-18SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
2014-03-18SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014
2014-03-12SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
2014-03-05SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
2014-01-23SenateP2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
2014-01-22SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-01-21SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1852 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 826

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback