TN SB1800 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the maximum age for a victim of aggravated rape of a child from three years of age to eight years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, increases the maximum age for a victim of aggravated rape of a child from three years of age to eight years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 588 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1718 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 588