TN SB1786 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, provides paid family and medical leave for state employees and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2020-01-27SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2024 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback