TN SB1785 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offenses of aggravated assault and assault against a first responder to include an assault involving the use or display of any article used or fashioned to lead the victim to reasonably believe it to be a deadly weapon. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to certain criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/15/2022 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1678 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee