TN SB1785 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability to conduct a study of before and after school programs available to K-12 students in this state and issue a report to the speaker and education committee of each chamber by February 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability to conduct a study of before and after school programs available to K-12 students in this state and issue a report to the speaker and education committee of each chamber by February 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/26/2020
2020-01-27SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2030 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback