TN SB1777 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the commission on aging and disabilities to design and oversee a resource mapping of federal, state, and nongovernmental resources and funding streams that support the health, safety, and welfare of persons 60 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the commission on aging and disabilities to design and oversee a resource mapping of federal, state, and nongovernmental resources and funding streams that support the health, safety, and welfare of persons 60 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13 Pub. Ch. 548
2018-03-13 Effective date(s) 03/09/2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-02-28SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-02-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-02-27SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-02-27SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-02-26HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-02-26HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-02-26HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-02-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-02-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2018
2018-02-14SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/14/2018
2018-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-23SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1750 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 548

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback