TN SB1776 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the sale and use of novelties and sparkling devices under certain circumstances in all cities, towns, municipalities, and counties in the state. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the sale and use of novelties and sparkling devices under certain circumstances in all cities, towns, municipalities, and counties in the state. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1856 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee