TN SB1763 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows written waivers, exculpatory agreements, or releases executed by whitewater rafting professionals to be kept in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 7, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows written waivers, exculpatory agreements, or releases executed by whitewater rafting professionals to be kept in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 7, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2020-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/10/2020
2020-02-05SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/5/2020
2020-01-23SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1569 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback