TN SB1763 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, imposes a $2.00 tax on a sexually oriented business for each customer that enters; provides for revenue being allocated to the general fund with the intent that amounts be allocated to programs for victims of sex trafficking; schedules the tax to be repealed on July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, imposes a $2.00 tax on a sexually oriented business for each customer that enters; provides for revenue being allocated to the general fund with the intent that amounts be allocated to programs for victims of sex trafficking; schedules the tax to be repealed on July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764 | |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1701 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 764