TN SB1762 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 753
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 753
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the powers of the board of trustees of the University of Tennessee system. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the powers of the board of trustees of the University of Tennessee system. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 753 | |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to last calendar. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1696 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 753