TN SB1762 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement that fiscal note be done in 10 days from introduction of bill; requires fiscal note to be done once standing committee of either house places the bill on calendar. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2; Title 3, Chapter 7 and Section 4-56-107.
Title
As introduced, removes requirement that fiscal note be done in 10 days from introduction of bill; requires fiscal note to be done once standing committee of either house places the bill on calendar. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2; Title 3, Chapter 7 and Section 4-56-107.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | S. Reset on cal. for 3-17-14 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0681) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-10 - Re-ref. to State Government Committee