TN SB1760 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, encourages local boards of education to develop partnerships with nonprofit youth leadership and development organizations in their community to permit the use of school buildings and school property at a reduced fee or at no cost to the nonprofit organization. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, encourages local boards of education to develop partnerships with nonprofit youth leadership and development organizations in their community to permit the use of school buildings and school property at a reduced fee or at no cost to the nonprofit organization. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |