TN SB1756 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes issuance of a Linemen Power Tennessee new specialty earmarked license plate to operators of vehicles that are used for passenger transport, owned by an entity that is subject to the Rural Electric and Community Services Cooperative Act, and that have a maximum gross weight less than 9,000 pounds. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes issuance of a Linemen Power Tennessee new specialty earmarked license plate to operators of vehicles that are used for passenger transport, owned by an entity that is subject to the Rural Electric and Community Services Cooperative Act, and that have a maximum gross weight less than 9,000 pounds. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 785 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/10/2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1640 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 785