TN SB1754 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 590
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 590
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds advanced practice nurses to the list of deponents who are exempt from subpoena to trial but are subject to subpoena to deposition. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101.
Title
As enacted, adds advanced practice nurses to the list of deponents who are exempt from subpoena to trial but are subject to subpoena to deposition. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Pub. Ch. 590 |
2014-04-01 | House | Effective date(s) 03/28/2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-17 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-11 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0690) |
2014-03-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0652) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1556 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 590