TN SB1752 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes issuance of Combat Action new specialty earmarked license plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes issuance of Combat Action new specialty earmarked license plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 825 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/21/2016 | |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-04-06 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0725) |
2016-04-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0555) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee; Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Transportation Committee 2-22-16 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation & Safety Committee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1799 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 825