TN SB1751 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes exemption from amusement tax for physical fitness facilities that have a square footage of 15,000 or more; imposes amusement tax on all physical fitness facilities, regardless of size; retains exemption for certain nonprofit facilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, removes exemption from amusement tax for physical fitness facilities that have a square footage of 15,000 or more; imposes amusement tax on all physical fitness facilities, regardless of size; retains exemption for certain nonprofit facilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee / Behind Budget |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1736 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee