TN SB1743 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds acupuncture, chiropractic, occupational therapy, and physical therapy services performed by authorized persons to the list of healthcare services that may be included as covered TennCare medical assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, adds acupuncture, chiropractic, occupational therapy, and physical therapy services performed by authorized persons to the list of healthcare services that may be included as covered TennCare medical assistance. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1556 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020