TN SB1736 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 947
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, provides immunity from civil liability to a person, business, or other entity that owns, controls, or manages property and has the authority to prohibit weapons on that property by positing, with respect to any claim based on the person's, business's, or other entity's failure to adopt such a policy. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, provides immunity from civil liability to a person, business, or other entity that owns, controls, or manages property and has the authority to prohibit weapons on that property by positing, with respect to any claim based on the person's, business's, or other entity's failure to adopt such a policy. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02 Pub. Ch. 947
2016-05-02 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-04-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-04-21SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-04-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-04-18HousePassed H., Ayes 77, Nays 13, PNV 0
2016-04-18HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1057)
2016-04-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-03-17HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-03-16SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-03-16SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4
2016-03-16SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0692)
2016-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2016
2016-03-08SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1
2016-03-02SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
2016-03-01SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2016
2016-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
2016-02-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/1/2016
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016
2016-02-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/23/2016
2016-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016
2016-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2033 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback