TN SB1729 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offense of aggravated stalking to include persons who purchase a semi-automatic rifle or attempt to use a semi-automatic rifle for the course and furtherance of stalking. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 39, Chapter 17, relative to stalking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1728 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee