TN SB1729 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires public institutions of higher education to classify a student who is the spouse or dependent child of a service member as an in-state student for tuition purposes, regardless of the spouse's or dependent child's domicile or place of residence. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires public institutions of higher education to classify a student who is the spouse or dependent child of a service member as an in-state student for tuition purposes, regardless of the spouse's or dependent child's domicile or place of residence. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1665 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020