TN SB1728 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the offense of criminal abortion does not include an abortion that was necessary due to a medical emergency affecting the physical or mental health of the pregnant person or performed on a patient whose pregnancy was the result of rape or incest; requires the physician performing the abortion to verify that the patient reported the offense to the appropriate law enforcement agency prior to the procedure. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to women's health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1729 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn.