TN SB1727 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the state and local governments from contracting with companies that boycott Israel; requires the Tennessee consolidated retirement system (TCRS) to divest direct holdings in companies that boycott Israel; requires treasurer to maintain a list of such companies. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the state and local governments from contracting with companies that boycott Israel; requires the Tennessee consolidated retirement system (TCRS) to divest direct holdings in companies that boycott Israel; requires treasurer to maintain a list of such companies. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2142 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee