TN SB1722 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, repeals the law that allows handgun carry permit holders to transport or store a firearm or firearm ammunition in the permit holder's motor vehicle while on or utilizing a public or private parking area if the firearm or firearm ammunition is kept from ordinary observation. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, repeals the law that allows handgun carry permit holders to transport or store a firearm or firearm ammunition in the permit holder's motor vehicle while on or utilizing a public or private parking area if the firearm or firearm ammunition is kept from ordinary observation. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
2020-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020
2020-06-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-06-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
2020-01-23SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2368 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback