TN SB1722 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that liability for legal and financial obligations pertaining to real property subject to a lease and payment in lieu of tax (PILOT) agreement remains with the person who transferred title to the municipality or corporation; provides immunity for the municipality or corporation. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53, Part 3 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, provides that liability for legal and financial obligations pertaining to real property subject to a lease and payment in lieu of tax (PILOT) agreement remains with the person who transferred title to the municipality or corporation; provides immunity for the municipality or corporation. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53, Part 3 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Pub. Ch. 162 | |
2011-05-10 | Effective date(s) 05/05/11 | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-27 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-21 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-21 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-21 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-04-04 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-31 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-31 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1020 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 162