TN SB1720 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, declares that a person who holds a valid medical marijuana patient identification card issued by another state does not commit an offense in this state if the person possesses marijuana not in excess of one-half ounce. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, declares that a person who holds a valid medical marijuana patient identification card issued by another state does not commit an offense in this state if the person possesses marijuana not in excess of one-half ounce. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2423 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee