TN SB1713 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions regarding requirements given in invitations to bidders. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions regarding requirements given in invitations to bidders. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14HousePub. Ch. 644
2014-04-14HouseEffective date(s) 07/01/2014
2014-04-08HouseSigned by Governor.
2014-03-27HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2014-03-27HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2014-03-27HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2014-03-25HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2014-03-24HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0
2014-03-24HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0924)
2014-03-24HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2014-03-13SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2014-03-10SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2014-03-10SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
2014-03-10SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0730)
2014-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/10/2014
2014-03-05SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2014-03-05SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
2014-03-04SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014
2014-02-26SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
2014-02-25SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/4/2014
2014-02-19SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014
2014-02-10SenateRef. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
2014-02-10SenateRecalled from S. C&L Comm.
2014-01-22SenateP2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
2014-01-16SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-01-15SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1671 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 644

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback